ZION TABERNACLE CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 515225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 05 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 24 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required