ZION TABERNACLE CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 515225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.17k £6.42k £7.17k £7.52k £7.13k
Total expenditure £6.06k £5.67k £5.49k £7.28k £6.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A