Financial history JACOBS WELL APPEAL

Charity number: 515235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.28m £1.92m £3.84m £3.52m £2.87m
Total expenditure £1.67m £1.94m £4.15m £3.46m £2.80m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £58.57k
Income - Donations and legacies £115.27k £1.87m £3.72m £413.11k £2.78m
Income - Other trading activities £94.73k £54.77k £101.52k £12.93k £91.01k
Income - Charitable activities £2.05m £0 £0 £3.10m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £157 £1 £0 £3.50k £0
Income - Other £15.10k £0 £23.99k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £94.44k £0 £220.46k £2.99k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.52m £1.77m £3.98m £3.29m £2.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £73.07k £167.79k £72.71k £73.37k £65.86k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £1.12k £9.97k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £73.74k £0 £97.00k £102.79k £91.24k