Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE SOLWAY PLAIN

Charity number: 1187312
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

25 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev BRYAN ROTHWELL Chair 01 November 2018
THE LONGCAKE CHARITY
Received: On time
DUNDRAW MISSION ROOM
Received: On time
CUMBERLAND AND WESTMORLAND CONVALESCENT INSTITUTION
Received: On time
LONGCAKE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Susan Margaret Shardlow Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Ruth Pinguey Trustee 31 October 2021
NEWTON ARLOSH PARISH HALL
Received: On time
JOSEPHINE JEFFERSON Trustee 31 October 2021
KIRKBRIDE CHURCH INSTITUTE
Overdue by 330 days
Stephen Sowerby Trustee 31 October 2021
KIRKBRIDE CHURCH INSTITUTE
Overdue by 330 days
Ann Little Trustee 31 October 2021
None on record
Sarah Ann Whitaker Trustee 31 October 2021
None on record
Barbara Stephens Trustee 30 May 2021
CULTERHAM HALL
Received: On time
Judith Bryan Trustee 30 May 2021
None on record
Susan Roberts Trustee 30 August 2020
None on record
Shirley Holland-Reid Trustee 30 August 2020
None on record
Rev Andrew David Callaway Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
BRIAN BAILEY Trustee 03 March 2019
CULTERHAM HALL
Received: On time
Pauline Stagg Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Mary Hodgson Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Jane Launchbury Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Peter Royle Wardle Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Francess Mary McIntyre Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Marjorie Harrison Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Margaret Graham Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Christine Margaret Young Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Anita Norman Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Margaret Elaine Atkinson Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
Margaret Rose Pickering Trustee 03 March 2019
None on record
TIMOTHY WARD BARKER Trustee 01 November 2018
None on record