BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1192203
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Clive Dobbs Trustee 22 November 2017 None on record
Romain Pizzi Trustee 20 November 2019
BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Christopher James Laurence Chair 09 November 2011 None on record
Fiona Catherine Fell Trustee 14 November 2018
BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Julian Arnold Martin Kupfer Trustee 23 November 2016
BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Deidre Marie Carson Trustee 20 November 2019
BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Justine Claire Ruth Shotton Trustee 20 November 2019
BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Rebecca Jayne Schofield Trustee 06 June 2017 None on record
Kathryn Amanda Mellor Trustee 14 November 2018
BRITISH VETERINARY ASSOCIATION ANIMAL WELFARE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Charlotte Burn Trustee 20 November 2019 None on record