CYLCH MEITHRIN BRYN TABOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cylch Meithrin Bryn Tabor is a Welsh medium pre-school play group based at Ysgol Bryn Tabor, Coedpoeth near Wrexham providing educational services for children from age two.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £15,737 from 3 government contract(s) and £8,345 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Wrexham
Governance
- 12 December 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anita Robinson -Rogers | Chair | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Williams | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adrienne Jones | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Lloyd | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £15.74k | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2024 | 921 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 March 2025 | 1152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
AMCAN[ION] Y SCE YW: HYRWYDDO ADDYSG GYFRWNG CYMRAEG I BLANT OED CYN YSGOL YN (NODWCH DRE NEU ARDAL) THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF WELSH LANGUAGE WITHIN COEDPOETH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
YSGOL BRYN TABOR
HEOL MAELOR
COEDPOETH
WREXHAM
LL11 3NB
- Phone:
- 01978722180
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window