Trustees London Development Trust

Charity number: 1189281
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Sarah Miriam Burke Trustee 16 June 2022
None on record
Sarah Rogers Trustee 15 November 2021
None on record
James Wand Trustee 12 November 2021
None on record
Jonathon Darby Trustee 03 June 2020
None on record
Emmanuel Wachukwu Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record
ROBERTSON ALEXANDER Trustee 27 February 2020
None on record
LONAS ANDREW Trustee 27 February 2020
None on record
MAKI NAKAGAWA Trustee 27 February 2020
None on record
Simon Peter Donovan Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record