TRAFFIKANALYSIS HUB LTD

Charity number: 1192933
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Peace Chair 01 December 2018 None on record
Elaine Mitchel-Hill Trustee 06 March 2020
SV2 - SUPPORTING VICTIMS OF SEXUAL VIOLENCE LTD Received: On time
NICHOLAS BERNARD FRANK FISHWICK Trustee 25 March 2021 None on record
Gary Miller Trustee 08 March 2021 None on record
JOHN CUSACK Trustee 06 March 2020 None on record
Professor Angela Henderson Trustee 16 March 2021 None on record
Jacqueline Planner Trustee 08 March 2021 None on record
Ruth Dearnley Trustee 05 July 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER'S, ST ALBANS Received: On time