DORSET COUNTY MUSEUM MUSIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of classic music Chamber Concerts for the education of members of the society and the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Dorset
Governance
- 09 January 2020: CIO registration
- 30 March 2022: Funds received from 1068999 DORSET COUNTY MUSEUM MUSIC SOCIETY
- Dorset Museum Music Society (Working name)
- MUSIC AT THE MUSEUM (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Richard Hall BA Phd | Chair | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Claire Dixon | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Goss | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALEC BAILEY MA, FCA | Trustee | 21 July 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £12.60k | £10.98k | £11.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £227 | £12.26k | £10.62k | £11.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Nonesuch Close
DORCHESTER
Dorset
DT1 2SW
- Phone:
- 01305602945
- Email:
- bailey.wabbas@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window