REFUGEE BIRIYANI & BANANAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Refugee Biriyani & Bananas aims to provide urgent aid and basic necessities to vulnerable people worldwide. This includes food, water, shelter items, shoes, clothes, season specific aid such as firewood in the winter and mosquito repellent in the summer, medical supplies, hygiene kits and baby products. We also raise awareness on the journeys of displaced people and advocate for them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
240 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Greece
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 19 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Junaed Razaq | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Munira Ahmed Yusuf | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Elena Martinez Garcia | Trustee | 05 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Aliya Abidi | Trustee | 29 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Triana Riazor Marquina | Trustee | 26 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amber Bauer | Trustee | 21 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Mantaqaa Akhtar | Trustee | 21 December 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.28k | £210.95k | £203.37k | £240.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.59k | £137.63k | £188.13k | £238.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 June 2022 | 150 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO HUNGER, SICKNESS OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY, OR EMOTIONAL OR MENTAL ILL-HEALTH), PRIMARILY ARISING FROM PUBLIC CALAMITY (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, WAR, CONFLICT AND NATURAL DISASTERS) AND GEO-POLITICAL CIRCUMSTANCES (INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, OPPRESSION OR POLITICAL PERSECUTION) IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF HUMANITARIAN, MEDICAL, DEVELOPMENTAL, HEALTH, EDUCATIONAL OR SOCIAL PROGRAMMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Clifton Road
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE4 8DQ
- Phone:
- 07984181736
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window