Accounts and annual returns LICHFIELD LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 515345
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 March 2022 318 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 June 2020 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 04 June 2019 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 25 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required