KETTERING GENERAL HOSPITAL RADIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Furthering the objects of the Charity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 18 February 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Kenneth Bellamy | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Clive Fone | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Alison Susan Scott | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72k | £3.56k | £3.11k | £5.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.40k | £2.93k | £3.40k | £3.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN KETTERING AND DISTRICT BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS, AND FOR PATIENTS RECEIVING COMMUNITY CARE; AND (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF THE BENEFITS OF LIVING A HEALTHY LIFESTYLE, AND THE IMPORTANCE OF MAINTAINING GOOD PERSONAL MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH BY (MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE MEANS OF BROADCASTING HEALTH EDUCATION MESSAGES TO PEOPLE LIVING IN KETTERING AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kettering General Hospital NHS Trus
Rothwell Road
KETTERING
NN16 8UZ
- Phone:
- 07771564638
- Email:
- admin@kghradio.co.uk
- Website:
-
kghradio.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window