CITY OF LIVERPOOL LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Liverpool Lions are ordinary people who do extraordinary things to help others and support good causes. We support a range of projects in the Merseyside area and because we are local we serve the unique needs of the communities in which we live.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 December 2019: CIO registration
- 18 December 2020: Funds received from 1035935 CITY OF LIVERPOOL LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Francis | Chair | 03 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Robin Rushton | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Armstrong | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin Baynes | Trustee | 03 December 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 27 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 392 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 392 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 758 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 758 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1123 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1123 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 23 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND AND WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY; PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALTH ISSUES; PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 VALLEYBROOK GROVE
WIRRAL
CH63 9FR
- Phone:
- 01515127510
- Email:
- liondavidelliott@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window