Trustees OUR DEMENTIA CHOIR

Charity number: 1187483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Vicky Lee McClure Chair 01 September 2019
None on record
Robert Tomlinson Trustee 12 April 2022
None on record
Les Marshall Trustee 12 April 2022
None on record
Thomas Richard Dening Trustee 12 April 2022
None on record
Daniela Smith Trustee 07 February 2022
None on record
Grace Pauline Meadows Trustee 27 September 2021
THE MUSIC THERAPY CHARITY
Received: On time
Mark De Lisser Trustee 05 February 2021
None on record
Karen Bonser Trustee 05 February 2021
None on record
Marc William Wall Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Paul Day Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Camilla Rachel Lewis Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record