LOSTOCK GRALAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lostock Gralam Community Centre Association manages the centre at Stubbs Lane, Lostock Gralam. We have a hall, committee room, kitchen and large car park with lighting. Regular groups meet at the centre including parents and toddlers, yoga and dance. The hall is available for hire for parties, conferences and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 01 August 1984: Standard registration
- 26 January 2022: Funds received from 1111589 LOSTOCK GRALAM YOUTH CLUB
- LOSTOCK GRALAM COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kath Hodgkinson | Trustee | 10 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Fitton | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Foley Hodges | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Imelda McGuiness | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Walker | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Walker | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.22k | £13.35k | £17.27k | £19.50k | £17.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.64k | £11.93k | £12.04k | £15.59k | £20.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 NOVEMBER 1983 as amended on 28 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LOSTOCK GRALAM AND DISTRICT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORD TO ADVANCE EDUCATION ANDTO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
LOSTOCK GRALAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Birches Lane
Lostock Green
NORTHWICH
Cheshire
CW9 7SN
- Phone:
- 07931 374206
- Email:
- lostockgralamcc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
lostockgralamcommunitycentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window