Trustees CLAYTON-LE-WOODS COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 515392
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Mitchell | Chair | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Elvey | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Ridgway | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Skinner | Trustee | 03 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER JAMES | Trustee | 31 October 2011 |
|
|||||
MRS JENNY MCMAHON | Trustee | 12 March 1995 |
|
|
||||
JENNY MCMAHON MBE | Trustee | 06 June 1988 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.