THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STOCKING FARM AND BEAUMONT LEYS

Charity number: 1188113
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DENNIS ARTHUR HEMSLEY Trustee 01 September 2015
LEICESTER STROKE CLUB Received: On time
Brenda Mary Shepherd Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Elizabeth Mary Smith Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Gloria Mary Wright Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Trevor David Hesselwood B Eng Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Rev Robert Charles Hinsley Chair 30 September 2021 None on record
Patricia Ivy Harrison Trustee 29 June 2021 None on record
Susan Alice Hesselwood Trustee 01 September 2015 None on record
Brian Thomas Whitehead Trustee 01 June 2015 None on record
Catherine Erica Wray Trustee 26 April 2020 None on record
Mary Whitehead Trustee 01 June 2015 None on record