BEDFORD LADIES AND GIRLS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bedford Ladies and Girls Football Club offers opportunities for girls and ladies to play association football at an amateur level. The club offers Walking Football, and runs after-school sessions to allow more girls to try football and encourage them to consider playing.Youth teams play in the FA Bedfordshire Girls League. Ladies teams play in the Eastern Region Womens Football League.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 04 March 2020: CIO registration
- BEDFORD GIRLS FC (Working name)
- BEDFORD GIRLS FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
- BEDFORD LADIES FC (Working name)
- BEDFORD LADIES FOOTBALL CLUB (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jill Upton | Chair | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Clarke | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zara Carroll | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Yildiz | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Fhalora | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy West | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Martin-Harris | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Trinder | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.25k | £43.83k | £57.85k | £76.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.52k | £44.83k | £63.78k | £73.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE; (A) TO ADVANCE THE AMATEUR SPORT OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR WOMEN AND GIRLS, IN THE BEDFORDSHIRE AREA AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS; (B) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES); (C) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 BROMHAM ROAD
BEDFORD
MK40 2AA
- Phone:
- 07850540631
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window