FRIENDS OF ROXBOURNE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
fundraising by organising events such as bake sales, summer fair, bonfire night. usually on school premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 February 2020: Standard registration
- FORC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rashid Benserghin | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr AYIA AL-ASADI | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/10/2020 | 01/10/2021 | 01/10/2022 | 01/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.40k | £1.12k | £12.85k | £19.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.88k | £1.58k | £8.97k | £18.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 October 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 October 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROXBOURNE PRIMARY SCHOOL
TORBAY ROAD
HARROW
HA2 9QF
- Phone:
- 02084229207
- Email:
- forc@roxbourne.harrow.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window