TWO ROADS EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND SAFETY CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We deliver training that reduces risk associated with common mental health issues such as depression and anxiety.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 20 March 2020: CIO registration
- Two Roads Charity (Working name)
- TWO ROADS CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Callaghan | Chair | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mathew Fox | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Bannon | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carol Grogan | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.98k | £31.05k | £67.27k | £20.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.27k | £22.42k | £38.49k | £21.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATED TO THE PREVENTION OF SUICIDES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 London Road
Datchet
SLOUGH
SL3 9JN
- Phone:
- 07771732591
- Email:
- EDDIE@TWOROADSCHARITY.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window