TOOTING COMMUNITY KITCHEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty among people who are homeless or in need of food provision support in London. By providing food, drink and other items and services to individuals in need and or charities, or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty. Currently we provide food stalls 4 times a week and have a weekly foodbank for those in the community who need our assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £15,800 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 01 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gulshan Parveen Ahmed | Chair | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Keith Mooney | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivier Laurent Couillaud | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.78k | £57.68k | £122.58k | £112.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.50k | £54.11k | £68.97k | £110.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.86k | N/A | £14.88k | £15.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 March 2022
(These accounts |
10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2021
(These accounts |
28 March 2022 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE HOMELESS IN LONDON BY PROVIDING FOOD, DRINK AND OTHER ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
49 Park Avenue
MITCHAM
SURREY
CR42ER
- Phone:
- 07341930343
- Email:
- tckfinance1@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window