Trustees COMPANY OF OTHERS

Charity number: 1190629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony McCaffery Trustee 12 May 2022
None on record
Sathya Bala Trustee 21 April 2022
CLIC SARGENT CANCER CARE FOR CHILDREN
Received: On time
Sharminy Ragunathan Trustee 21 February 2022
None on record
Louise Wiggins Trustee 25 January 2022
None on record
Hilary Clare Knight Trustee 05 December 2019
None on record
Elif True Trustee 02 October 2017
None on record
Nadia Iftkhar Trustee 19 February 2016
None on record