Financial history THE ARKWRIGHT SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 515526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.51m £1.54m £1.37m £1.35m £1.93m
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.81m £1.47m £1.53m £1.43m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.99k N/A N/A £10.80k £1.19m
Income - Donations and legacies £325.09k £348.65k £234.24k £176.86k £32.48k
Income - Other trading activities £640.73k £593.48k £633.13k £591.96k £262.74k
Income - Charitable activities £507.97k £544.58k £442.88k £504.28k £417.29k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £110 £62 £231 £178 £7
Income - Other £33.92k £57.96k £55.08k £80.32k £1.22m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.20m £937.55k £960.94k £1.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £621.18k £607.27k £529.58k £572.81k £399.93k
Expenditure - Governance £16.82k £14.82k £12.70k £14.82k £15.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0