Trustees THE ARKWRIGHT SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 515526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Rivers CBE Chair 04 September 2021
None on record
LAURA JEAN SUMMERS Trustee 17 November 2021
CITY OF NOTTINGHAM HISTORIC BUILDINGS LIMITED
Received: On time
Dr Catherine Clare Feely Trustee 17 November 2021
THE FRIENDS OF FRIAR GATE BRIDGE
Received: On time
NEIL RIDDLE Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Amanda Rawlings Trustee 20 October 2021
None on record
Helen Bishop Trustee 20 October 2021
None on record
Dr RICHARD ARTHUR GAUNT Trustee 01 March 2018
NOTTINGHAM CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE THOROTON SOCIETY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Received: On time
WENDY TRACEY Trustee 01 March 2018
None on record
Geoffrey Duncan Lewins Trustee 02 March 2016
None on record
Greg Pickup Trustee 03 June 2015
None on record
Michael Atkinson Trustee 16 December 2013
None on record