PEPPER STREET FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pepper Street Foundation is a UK based charity that works with deprived communities to identify opportunities for pioneering projects that change lives by providing funding and guidance for inspired 'social marketing' projects that apply the latest marketing thinking to shift mindsets and allow individuals and communities to access the contacts and resources they need to pilot new initiatives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Segar Reddy Phd | Chair | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Foreshew | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Slobodan Marceta | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100 | £1.44k | £1.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 17 July 2024 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 167 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY: I. PROVIDING TRAINING, CONFERENCES AND SEMINARS ON SUBJECTS RELEVANT TO THE EFFICIENCY OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR; II. IDENTIFYING NEEDS IN THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR AND ESTABLISHING PROJECTS OR POLICIES TO ADDRESS THEM; III.ASSISTING IN THE ADMINISTRATION OF FUNDING PROGRAMMES TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, MONITORING FOR GRANTS, RECOMMENDING GRANTS, ASSISTING IN APPLICATIONS FOR GRANTS; THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR’ MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS. ·CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. ·VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION.VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A CARLTON ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 7RZ
- Phone:
- 07712937443
- Website:
-
pepperstreetfoundation.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window