Accounts and annual returns SOUTHBOURNE (WEST SUSSEX ) LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity number: 1189071
Charity reporting is overdue by 45 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 45 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 45 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 03 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 03 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 23 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window