Trustees DR M E BRADSHAW'S TEESDALE SPECIAL FLORA RESEARCH & CONSERVATION TRUST
Charity number: 1188288
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin John Rogers | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Friend | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bruce John Gray Wilkinson | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julia Anne Nelson | Trustee | 12 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Gowman Maddison | Trustee | 06 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Geoffrey Stanley Herbert | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Elizabeth Proctor | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.