Accounts and annual returns BXM INSPIRED

Charity number: 1188996
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 135 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 05 December 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 23 January 2023 54 days late
Annual return 31 January 2021 11 March 2022 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 11 March 2022 101 days late