Governing document LINCOLNSHIRE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 SEPTEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 9 MAY 2002, 13 JANUARY 2005, 10 MAY 2007 AND 7 JANUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND IMPROVE AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL INDUSTRIES AND ASSOCIATED TRADES, CRAFTS AND PROFESSIONS; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION OR IMPROVEMENT THROUGH THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF SUSTAINABLE MANAGEMENT OF NATURAL RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.