Trustees PUBLIC INTEREST NEWS FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1191397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Patrick Leslie James Swaffer | Chair | 18 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Alison Sarah Gow | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Polly Elizabeth Curtis | Trustee | 16 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joan Hannah Oluwayemisi Adetunji | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julius Weinberg | Trustee | 12 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Roughol | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
LORD INGLEWOOD WILLIAM RICHARD FLETCHER VANE | Trustee | 18 November 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.