THE RISUAL FOUNDATION


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 28 April 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The risual Foundation has been established with one core focus giving back to people communities and businesses wherever we possibly can We aim to lend a helping hand by raising money providing technology opening up learning opportunities supporting the growth of young peoples careers bettering local communities and much more
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Proud | Chair | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Sharp | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Lincoln | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brian Cain | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Alun Rogers | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.68k | £4.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.28k | £5.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO FURTHER FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, BY MAKING GRANTS AND AWARDS TO CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN FURTHERING CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND BY SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING VOLUNTEER ACTIVITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O RISUAL LTD
12 PARKER COURT
STAFFORDSHIRE TECHNOLOGY PARK
STAFFORD
ST18 0WP
- Phone:
- 01785221920
- Email:
- risualfoundation@risual.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window