LAWRENCE HOME NURSING TEAM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
When asked, most of us say we want to die at home, in the comfort of familiar surroundings close to those we love. The Lawrence Home Nursing Team gives people and their families the support they need to make that possible. Providing free hands-on care, day and night, our nurses help to fulfil the wishes of anyone who wants to die peacefully at home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,706 from 1 government contract(s) and £1,592 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 19 May 2020: Standard registration
- 31 August 2022: Funds received from 1076445 LAWRENCE HOME NURSING TEAM
- Lawrence Nurses (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jonathan Adam Galloway Williams | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Nolan | Trustee | 06 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STEPHEN GREAVES | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Robert Johnston | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|||||
JOHN CAREY HAVELOCK PRITCHARD DipM | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNA JO Mathers | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Danielle Hallam-Evans | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Mathers | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.13m | £739.75k | £435.25k | £447.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £299.12k | £463.54k | £417.52k | £499.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £20.34k | £20.71k | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | £1.59k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.10m | £361.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £24.07k | £301.25k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.48k | £77.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £16.00k | £10.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £299.12k | £351.43k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £112.12k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.09k | £3.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT OF TERMINALLY ILL PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF NURSING CARE IN THE HOMES OF SUCH PERSONS WITHIN AN AREA AS SHALL BE DEFINED BY THE CHARITY FROM TIME TO TIME. TO PROVIDE CHARITABLE PALLIATIVE CARE NURSING SERVICES INCLUDING SPECIALIST ADVICE, NURSING CARE AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT. TO ARRANGE AND DELIVER ALL ANCILLARY SERVICES TO SUPPORT AND FINANCE PALLIATIVE CARE AND DELIVERY. TO SUPPORT (AND RECEIVED SUPPORT FROM) OTHER PALLIATIVE CARE CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS (INCLUDING STATE OWNED/MANAGED/GOVERNED/OUTSOURCED) WHICH IN THE INTERESTS OF THE DIRECTORS IS MUTUALLY BENEFICIAL. TO PROVIDE OTHER CHARITABLE SERVICES TO SUPPORT ANY END OF LIFE REQUIREMENTS FOR PATIENTS AND IMPACTED PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHIPPING NORTON COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
RUSSELL WAY
CHIPPING NORTON
OX7 5FA
- Phone:
- 01608641549
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window