TOURING EXHIBITIONS GROUP

Charity number: 1191056
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maria Ragan Trustee 21 July 2020 None on record
Elena May Saggers Trustee 20 April 2021 None on record
Natalie Patel Trustee 04 May 2018 None on record
Emma Daker Trustee 03 May 2019 None on record
Karen Lewis Trustee 22 May 2014 None on record
NICOLA JANE ELIZABETH COLEBY Chair 21 April 2017
HOUSE FESTIVAL LIMITED Received: On time
Janine Parrish Trustee 03 May 2019 None on record