Accounts and annual returns SHAHJALAL ACADEMY

Charity number: 1188405
Charity reporting is overdue by 874 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 February 2024 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 144 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 March 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 874 days