Financial history HALESOWEN PROJECT FOR THE ELDERLY

Charity number: 515744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.53k £16.28k £17.26k £15.70k £178
Total expenditure £17.46k £17.37k £20.31k £16.02k £10.47k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A