Trustees EMICS (EAST MIDLANDS IMMEDIATE CARE SCHEME) CIO

Charity number: 1188852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Timothy John Gray MBE Chair 08 February 2020
None on record
Dr John Kingsley Inman Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Dr PETER JOHN PASHLEY HOLDEN Trustee 30 April 2020
MAGPAS
Received: On time
THE CAMERON FUND
Received: On time
Dr John Benjamin Coyle Trustee 30 April 2020
None on record
David Vincent Ford FCA Trustee 20 April 2020
None on record
Mary Christina Boothroyd Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record