BEALONIANS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bealonians Football Club are a highly regarded grassroots amateur football club for the local community based in Barkingside, Fairlop, Hainault and surrounding area on the London/Essex border. As an England Football Accredited Club we prioritises child welfare and offers opportunities for all. We manage facilities that enables social cohesiveness and an excellent playing environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Newham
- Redbridge
Governance
- 16 March 2020: CIO registration
- OLD BEALONIANS FC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY BARLOW | Chair | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
William George Blackwell | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nick Newell | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Gunn | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Garnier | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Hall | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Maria Newell | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Lucy Pender | Trustee | 15 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MACRAE | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Machin | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS HURST | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Graham Shepherd | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Lazarus | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.94k | £188.73k | £174.12k | £265.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.70k | £202.85k | £163.01k | £219.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 29 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2022
(These accounts |
28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE BEALONIANS FOOTBALL CLUB IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY PROMOTING FOOTBALL AND PROVIDING AN ENVIRONMENT FOR THE RESIDENTS OF ILFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS REGARDLESS OF RACE, FAITH OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION TO PARTICIPATE IN FOOTBALL THROUGH ORGANISED COACHING AND PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL LEAGUES
Contact information
- Address:
-
JACK CARTER PAVILION
OAKFIELD PLAYING FIELDS
FENCEPIECE ROAD
ILFORD
IG6 2JL
- Phone:
- 07979 706456
- Email:
- info@bealoniansfc.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window