LEVEL UP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We identify and provide assistive technology solutions for communication, entertainment, learning and independence, to enable individuals to realise their potential and maximise their abilities in all aspects of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Jayne Elizabeth Taylor | Chair | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clare Elizabeth Robinson | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee Dart | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.38k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | 02 February 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 367 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 01 April 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | 02 February 2025 | 732 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD THERAPEUTIC REHABILITATION BY PROVISION OF:- 1. ASSISTIVE TECHNOLOGIES AND TRAINING TO RELEVANT STAKEHOLDERS, WHERE IT IS LIKELY THAT THE PROVISION OF ASSISTIVE TECHNOLOGY WILL BENEFIT THE INDIVIDUAL’S LIFE IN EITHER COMMUNICATION, EDUCATION OR MANAGEMENT OF DAILY LIVING TASKS AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES; 2. TO IMPROVE ACCESS TO EDUCATION, AND OUTCOMES FOR LEARNING, AT ANY EDUCATION OR TRAINING PROVIDER THE CHARITY DEEMS WOULD BENEFIT FROM INTERVENTION, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ASSISTIVE TECHNOLOGIES, NOT PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, THROUGH ASSESSMENT, SUPPLY OF EQUIPMENT AND TRAINING. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, ‘ASSISTIVE TECHNOLOGY’ IS AN UMBRELLA TERM THAT DESCRIBES THE ASSISTIVE, ADAPTIVE, AND REHABILITATIVE DEVICE AND SOFTWARE SOLUTIONS USED TO SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES TO LIVE MORE INDEPENDENT LIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NEWBY OP
12 THE STABLES
NEWBY HALL
RIPON
HG4 5AE
- Phone:
- 0758072841
- Email:
- mike@accesstechnology.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window