SHADWELL TENNIS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shadwell Tennis Club provides outdoor tennis facilities on two courts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,100 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 15 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Margaret Maiden | Chair | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lionel George Etherington | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Bell | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tawona Moyo | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Stephenson | Trustee | 02 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.71k | £29.38k | £82.00k | £38.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.71k | £6.41k | £50.20k | £7.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.79k | £21.27k | £7.23k | £4.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
26 November 2023 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHADWELL BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING TENNIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Ginnel
rear of 153 MAIN STREET
SHADWELL
LEEDS
- Phone:
- 447714197945
- Website:
-
clubspark.lta.org.uk/ShadwellTennisClub
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window