CENTENNIAL OLD STUDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Centennial Old Students Association is geared towards raising funds to provide scholarships for deserving students who successfully complete their school leaving examination and are qualified to enter University. We also undertake the development of the school's infrastructure which was badly damaged during the last civil war in Sierra Leone. We provide assistance to some of our elderly members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sierra Leone
Governance
- 27 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMANUEL YOUNG | Chair | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Sesay | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Noah Deen-Jalloh | Trustee | 29 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £600 | £1.70k | £2.07k | £980 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.62k | £550 | £3.50k | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 April 2025 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 April 2025 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 May 2023 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 May 2023 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 February 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 February 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 May 2020
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AT CENTENNIAL SECONDARY SCHOOL IN MATTRU JONG, BONTHE DISTRICT, SIERRA LEONE, BY PROVIDING EQUAL OPPORTUNITY TO BOYS AND GIRLS AT THE SCHOOL, TEACHING AND LEARNING RESOURCES AND POSITIVE ENCOURAGEMENT SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR POTENTIAL AND CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND SIERRA LEONE AS A WHOLE. 2. TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF EDUCATION AT CENTENNIAL SECONDARY SCHOOL BY PROVIDING A SAFE TEACHING AND LEARNING ENVIRONMENT FOR BOYS AND GIRLS, EQUIPPED WITH THE RELEVANT RESOURCES. 3. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF BOYS AND GIRLS AT CENTENNIAL SECONDARY SCHOOL, MATTRU JONG BY PROVIDING SCHOLARSHIP AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO CHILDREN IN NEED AT THE SCHOOL SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND BECOME PRODUCTIVE CITIZENS IN THE FUTURE.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 COSSALL WALK
LONDON
SE15 2TN
- Phone:
- 07956297255
- Email:
- hungbatei@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window