SALTAIRE VILLAGE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have continued to support local Saltaire initiatives. We also regularly attend meetings with other Saltaire Partners and contribute to discussions on the Management Plan for Saltaire. A key piece of work has been our input to the Local Development Framework in terms of how it affects Saltaire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
- 19 December 1984: Standard registration
- S V S (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Hallewell | Trustee | 02 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Sully | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE BUDDLE | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ulrike Knox | Trustee | 05 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.87k | £1.00k | £108 | £1.48k | £603 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.98k | £940 | £871 | £2.05k | £1.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 August 2024 | 208 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUNE 1984 AS AMENDED 21 MAY 2007
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE VILLAGE OF SALTAIRE IN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD IN THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE, WHICH AREA SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS "THE AREA OF BENEFIT". 1. TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFI 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECUTRE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 3. TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORICAL OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 4. TO PROMOTE THE INTERESTS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIO WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Victoria Road
SHIPLEY
BD18 3JR
- Phone:
- 07724770547
- Email:
- secretarysvs@googlemail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window