Trustees CAMBRIAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION FOR DEAF CHILDREN IN WALES

Charity number: 515848
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARGARET HUGHES JP Chair
None on record
Andrea Lewis Councillor Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
Michael John MORGAN Councillor Trustee 10 October 2017
None on record
Sallie Durbridge Trustee 08 May 2016
None on record
JUNE FRANCIS TALBOT Trustee 06 September 2011
None on record
ROGER MEREDITH Trustee 19 October 2004
None on record
JOHN JEREMY Trustee 16 October 2001
None on record
EDWARD JENKINS Trustee
CARDIFF DEAF CENTRE
Overdue by 195 days
NORMAN Brian MOORE Trustee
None on record