Accounts and annual returns ST. HELENA A.M.E EX-PUPILS ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity number: 1189034
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 20 December 2021 20 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 20 December 2020 15 November 2021 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 December 2020 Not submitted