YOUNG ACTIVE MINDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of educational training to improve the learning methods of children & young people in their school settings and within their communities. The delivery of training in enhanced memory techniques online and through workshops, courses and assemblies, visiting academic settings in person, as well as youth groups, libraries, public meeting spaces and other community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 May 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fabian Edward John Lord | Chair | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Poulter | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Montgomery-Everard Lord | Trustee | 04 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gabriela Silion | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marie Yolande Nicole Gooljar | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 June 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 June 2024 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN MEMORY TECHNIQUES AND MEMORY SKILLS IN ORDER TO DEVELOP THEIR INDIVIDUAL CAPABILITIES AND CAPACITIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND OTHER SIMILAR SESSIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Old Oak Gardens
Walton-Le-Dale
PRESTON
PR5 4BF
- Phone:
- 01772 628745
- Email:
- info@YoungActiveMinds.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window