SRINIVASA RETREAT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a holistic meditation retreat
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 July 2020: Standard registration
- SRINIVASA RETREAT (Working name)
- HEART MEDITATION RETREAT (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Campbell | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr MANISH PANKHANIA | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Diana Hale | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £891.45k | £87.85k | £78.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £41.85k | £68.48k | £54.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £884.88k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £466 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £6.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £41.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £331 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 21 October 2022 | 83 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 January 2022 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 FEB 2020 as amended on 12 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PHILOSOPHY, THEOLOGY, TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF THE VISHISHTA ADVAITA AND IN PARTICULAR THE TEACHINGS OF PARAMAHAMSA SRI SWAMI VISHWANANDA; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF ATMA KRIYA YOGA THROUGH THE LINEAGE OF MAHARATAR BABAJI AND SRI SWAMI VISHWANANDA: AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO ENGLISH LAW AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KEYSTONE LAW
48-49 CHANCERY LANE
LONDON
WC2A 1JF
- Phone:
- 02033193700
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window