AZAD KASHMIR WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 515922
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 22 February 2019 22 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 March 2018 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 March 2018 48 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 September 2017 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

20 September 2017 232 days late Download