Financial history AZAD KASHMIR WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 515922
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £108.38k £89.20k £115.08k £163.76k £158.04k
Total expenditure £81.91k £89.97k £110.70k £129.22k £148.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A