TEIGNMOUTH & DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a member-led organisation for retired and semi-retired people living in Teignmouth and District. It offers opportunities to meet regularly to share experiences, knowledge, philosophies, values and ideas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 15 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tricia Joan Forrester | Chair | 24 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jean Cox | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
John William Polley | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
William John Upsdale | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Margaret Browne | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Dickinson | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Inch | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.77k | £6.54k | £12.34k | £12.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.41k | £5.08k | £9.63k | £9.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.04k | £700 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT IN TEIGNMOUTH AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 ALTA VISTA CLOSE
TEIGNMOUTH
TQ14 8UW
- Phone:
- 07934200012
- Email:
- chair@teignmouthu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window