ALL ABOUT KIDS CHILD CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Club was formed 9th October 2020 to offer quality, accessible Childcare for children attending Ysgol Gronant. It was set up in response to demand from working parents looking for affordable and suitable Childcare in the area. The aim of All About Kids Child Care is to provide quality, accessible Out of School Childcare offering a range of play activities in a welcoming atmosphere
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Flintshire
Governance
- 09 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Elizabeth Leverett | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Dawn Bayliss | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Faye Sullivan | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jo Gillmore | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Watson | Trustee | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.53k | £34.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.36k | £33.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 89 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 454 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 18 April 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 18 April 2023 | 49 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 03 April 2022 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rural Nth Flintshire Family Centre
Nant Y Gro
Gronant
PRESTATYN
Flintshire
LL19 9YP
- Phone:
- 01745856119
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window