PROJECT WINGMAN FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Project Wingman is a group of current and former aircrew from all corners of aviation, United by our profession and dedicated to serving our NHS staff now and in the future. We provide space to unwind, de-compress and de-stress before, during and after hospital shifts, in support of staff wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 May 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carey Edwards | Chair | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Henderson MBE | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Jane Gauntlett | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Skelton | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ADAM GRIFFIN | Trustee | 13 August 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.31k | £251.17k | £144.75k | £102.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.54k | £105.41k | £170.26k | £214.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 09 March 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 09 March 2025 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 03 March 2022 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 APR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH AND AID THE WELL-BEING OF WORKERS IN HOSPITALS SUFFERING FROM EFFECTS OF THE STRESS CAUSED BY THE CHALLENGING AND SENSITIVE WORKLOAD THEY ARE EXPOSED TO IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, SUPPORT AND NUTRITION FOR SUCH PERSONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 Pall Mall
London
SW1Y 5EA
- Phone:
- 07889016950
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window